Financial history ANUEBI ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1148566
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £1.58k £1.37k £1.78k £2.02k £1.07k
Total expenditure £1.33k £150 £3.41k £293 £1.99k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A