Financial history THE UNITE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1147344
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £1.40m £1.81m £2.01m £3.12m £214.76k
Total expenditure £1.15m £1.52m £1.79m £1.95m £1.82m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.18m £1.55m £1.76m £3.02m N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment £226.80k £261.49k £251.16k £93.97k N/A
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.06m £1.39m £1.57m £1.95m N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Governance £7.35k £10.40k £7.96k £9.73k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other £93.88k £128.23k £224.24k £0 N/A