Trustees THE UNITE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1147344
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Professor Shan Wareing Chair 10 October 2018
THE UNITE FOUNDATION
Recently registered
James Watts Trustee 15 September 2021
THE UNITE FOUNDATION
Recently registered
Moray Notman Trustee 15 September 2021
THE UNITE FOUNDATION
Recently registered
Lloydette Bai-Marrow Trustee 18 June 2021
SPOTLIGHT ON CORRUPTION LTD
Received: On time
THE UNITE FOUNDATION
Recently registered
Sunday November Blake Trustee 18 June 2021
THE UNITE FOUNDATION
Recently registered
Tracey-Joy Harrison Trustee 18 June 2021
None on record
Ian Adams Trustee 10 May 2021
THE SINGLE HOMELESS PROJECT
Received: On time
AGE UK WESTMINSTER
Received: On time
THE UNITE FOUNDATION
Recently registered
Fiona Slaven Trustee 13 November 2020
THE UNITE FOUNDATION
Recently registered
GREENWICH STUDENTS UNION LTD
Received: On time
Jenny Shaw Trustee 02 October 2014
THE UNITE FOUNDATION
Recently registered
Nicholas James Miller Trustee 04 February 2014
None on record