Accounts and annual returns LAURA KINSELLA FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1145325
Charity reporting is overdue by 68 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2023 Overdue Overdue by 68 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Overdue Overdue by 68 days
Annual return 05 April 2022 28 February 2023 23 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 28 February 2023 23 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 04 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 04 February 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 05 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 05 February 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2019 27 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 27 November 2019 On time Download Open in new window