Trustees MERSEY WEAVER DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL
Charity Number: 1145482

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jeff Shaw | Chair | 29 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Krish Daryanani | Trustee | 06 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Aaron Cawley | Trustee | 06 May 2025 |
|
|||||
Grace Ellen Wheeler | Trustee | 03 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Steven Wheeler | Trustee | 20 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Oliver Chambers | Trustee | 26 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Lisa Pickstock | Trustee | 21 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Cath Mudford | Trustee | 30 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Ronald Sayle | Trustee | 05 June 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.