NEWCASTLE FRONTRUNNERS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE AIM'S OF OUR CHARITY ARE: - (1) THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR ATHLETICS. (2) TO PROMOTE EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY BY THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION IN RELATION TO LESBIAN, GAY, BISEXUAL AND TRANSGENDER PEOPLE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Durham
- Gateshead
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- North Tyneside
- Northumberland
- South Tyneside
- Sunderland
Governance
- 15 March 2012: Standard registration
- 17 December 2020: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 17 December 2020: Funds transferred to 1189438 NEWCASTLE FRONTRUNNERS
- NFR (Working name)
- NORTHERN FRONTRUNNERS (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2016 | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.53k | £24.65k | £25.64k | £26.60k | £13.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.66k | £24.64k | £22.29k | £23.18k | £18.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | £0 | £670 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 19 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 16 December 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 16 December 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2018 | 02 November 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2018 | 02 November 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2017 | 08 June 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2017 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11 OCT 2011 AS AMENDED ON 04 MAR 2012 AS AMENDED ON 23 NOV 2016
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE: (1) THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR ATHLETICS. (2) TO PROMOTE EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY BY THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION IN RELATION TO LESBIAN, GAY, BISEXUAL AND TRANSGENDER PEOPLE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window