AXIOM CARE LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are an approved provider of care under contract from the statutory services and provide a range of personal care and support services in a domiciliary environment and in sheltered housing and extra care schemes. These schemes provide independent accommodation in a safe, secure environment where people can access additional services such as dining facilities and chiropody.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Cambridgeshire
- Lincolnshire
- Northamptonshire
- Peterborough City
Governance
- 28 September 2012: Standard registration
- 11 July 2019: Removed (Does not operate)
- AXIOM CROSSROADS CARE (Working name)
- AXIOM CROSSROADS CARE LIMITED (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £294.27k | £550.21k | £879.65k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £420.76k | £651.80k | £918.89k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £550.21k | £879.65k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £646.78k | £931.99k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £5.02k | £13.09k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 16 January 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 12 January 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 25 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | 25 January 2017 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 07 NOV 2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09/08/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28/05/2014 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 24/09/2015
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION OF RELIEF BY WAY OF SERVICES TO PEOPLE IN NEED OF CARE AND SUPPORT AS A RESULT OF DISABILITY, ILLNESS, VULNERABILITY OR AGE WITHIN CAMBRIDGESHIRE AND NEIGHBOURING COUNTIES.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window