Accounts and annual returns CANOLFAN GYMUNEDOL YSTRADOWEN COMMUNITY CENTRE LTD

Charity number: 1147865
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 10 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 10 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 04 February 2021 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 04 February 2021 4 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 31 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 31 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 15 March 2019 43 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 15 March 2019 43 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 13 March 2018 41 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 13 March 2018 41 days late Download Open in new window