Trustees CANOLFAN GYMUNEDOL YSTRADOWEN COMMUNITY CENTRE LTD

Charity number: 1147865
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Keith Donald Davies Trustee 13 December 2021
YSTRADOWEN COMMUNITIES
Received: On time
Doreen Grove Trustee 18 November 2019
None on record
Marie Thomas Trustee 27 February 2019
None on record
Elwyn Williams Trustee 06 June 2017
None on record
David Belcher Trustee 06 June 2014
None on record