Financial history BELARUS FREE THEATRE

Charity number: 1147372
Charity reporting is up to date (119 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022
Total gross income £375.63k £492.22k £591.18k £826.79k £1.84m
Total expenditure £507.87k £469.29k £480.17k £646.02k £952.53k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £130.00k £185.63k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £530.32k £771.76k £1.81m
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £60.86k £55.03k £33.35k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £432.20k £599.33k £929.69k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £47.98k £46.69k £22.85k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £0 £4.05k £94.55k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0