Trustees SERIOUS TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1145535
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Joel Kibazo Chair 21 March 2019
THE MVULE TRUST
Received: On time
EDUCATION SUB-SAHARAN AFRICA
Received: On time
Child's i Foundation
Received: On time
Rodrigo Amalfi Voss Trustee 25 April 2023
None on record
ANNA FEUCHTWANG Trustee 24 January 2023
None on record
Froniga Lambert Trustee 24 January 2023
None on record
Vera Kwakofi Trustee 11 July 2017
None on record
Stephen Dudley Smith Trustee 29 July 2014
None on record
ANITA SCOTT Trustee 30 April 2014
THE ENGLISH STAGE COMPANY LIMITED
Received: On time