MISHKAN ME'AT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE JEWISH RELIGION THROUGH: A. THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF RELIGIOUS ARTEFACTS AND OTHE ITEMS USED IN RELIGIOUS SERVICES B. THE CONDUCTING OF RELIGIOUS SERVICES AND CEREMONIES C. THE PROMOTION OF PRAYER, STUDY AND PRAISE D. THE PROVISION OF RELIGIOUS INSTRUCTION AND SUPERVISION
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 02 February 2012: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr ROSA ANNE FREEDMAN | Trustee | 02 February 2012 |
|
|||||
SETH FREEDMAN | Trustee | 02 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW MARC DAVIS | Trustee | 01 February 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £30.00k | £9.80k | £1 | |
|
Total expenditure | £60 | £60 | £30.10k | £9.71k | £60 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 08 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 09 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 04 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 16 JAN 2012
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ORTHODOX JEWISH RELIGION THROUGH: A) THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF RELIGIOUS ARTEFACTS AND OTHER ITEMS USED IN RELIGIOUS SERVICES. B) THE CONDUCTING OF RELIGIOUS SERVICES AND CEREMONIES. C) THE PROMOTION OF PRAYER PRAISE AND STUDY. D) THE PROVISION OF RELIGIOUS INSTRUCTION AND SUPERVISION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
38 Chandos Road
Borehamwood
WD6 1UY
- Phone:
- 02035390295
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window