Accounts and annual returns FARMING AND WILDLIFE ADVISORY GROUP SOUTH WEST LTD

Charity number: 1146071
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 08 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 18 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 23 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 23 December 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 14 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 14 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 29 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 29 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 12 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 12 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window