Financial history FARMING AND WILDLIFE ADVISORY GROUP SOUTH WEST LTD

Charity number: 1146071
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £1.09m £1.38m £1.53m £1.93m £2.92m
Total expenditure £1.07m £1.28m £1.58m £1.94m £2.58m
Income from government contracts £224.47k £125.09k £169.15k £412.53k £771.70k
Income from government grants £248.46k £300.28k £808.74k £878.17k £1.23m
Income - Donations and legacies £85.14k £116.87k £81.20k £110.71k £142.65k
Income - Other trading activities £10.64k £13.47k £16.63k £23.62k £11.02k
Income - Charitable activities £995.86k £1.25m £1.43m £1.79m £2.76m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £52 £32 £0 £287 £41
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £2.23k £580
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.06m £1.26m £1.57m £1.90m £2.58m
Expenditure - Raising funds £12.20k £19.40k £17.84k £39.80k £4.22k
Expenditure - Governance £6.08k £4.63k £5.92k £5.64k £5.97k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £44.08k £3.75k £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0