Trustees FARMING AND WILDLIFE ADVISORY GROUP SOUTH WEST LTD

Charity number: 1146071
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Andrew Brian Hosford Chair 20 October 2015
None on record
Matthew Allan Morris Trustee 21 October 2020
None on record
Mark William James Pope Trustee 24 October 2018
None on record
Caroline Fowle Trustee 18 October 2017
None on record
ALOYSIA DAROS Trustee 09 November 2016
None on record
Robert Jackson Trustee 20 October 2015
THE COLN RIVER GROUP CHURCH CENTRE COMMITTEE
Received: On time