FRIENDS OF PLAS DOL-Y-MOCH

Charity number: 1147715
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £10.10k £63.40k £32.57k £16.39k £16.99k
Total expenditure £16.53k £12.89k £2.87k £2.98k £3.30k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A