Accounts and annual returns HOUSE FESTIVAL LIMITED

Charity number: 1147339
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 21 November 2021 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 09 March 2021 129 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 28 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 11 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 11 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 23 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 23 October 2017 On time Download Open in new window