Financial history HOUSE FESTIVAL LIMITED

Charity number: 1147339
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £142.35k £112.73k £21.62k £3.62k £0
Total expenditure £135.48k £101.04k £13.15k £5.51k £2.42k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £5.00k £5.00k N/A N/A N/A