COMMUNITY SPACES NORTHAMPTON

Charity number: 1146849
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2021 04 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 04 November 2021 On time Download
Annual return 29 February 2020 21 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 21 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 28 February 2019 17 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019

(These accounts
have been qualified)

17 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 28 February 2018 14 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2018

(These accounts
have been qualified)

14 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 28 February 2017 15 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2017 15 December 2017 On time Download