COMMUNITY SPACES NORTHAMPTON

Charity number: 1146849
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 28/02/2017 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020 28/02/2021
Total gross income £160.11k £234.58k £218.01k £284.90k £256.69k
Total expenditure £191.07k £198.60k £186.10k £258.71k £239.97k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £15.50k £106.28k £25.25k £98.98k £210.67k