CANBURY PARK CHURCH TRUST

Charity number: 1146287
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 22 September 2020 30 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 22 September 2020 30 March 2021 On time Download
Annual return 22 September 2019 16 October 2020 86 days late
Accounts and TAR 22 September 2019 16 October 2020 86 days late Download
Annual return 22 September 2018 02 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 22 September 2018 02 July 2019 On time Download
Annual return 22 September 2017 20 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 22 September 2017 20 March 2018 On time Download
Annual return 22 September 2016 22 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 22 September 2016 22 March 2017 On time Download