Financial history MERSEY YOUTH SUPPORT TRUST

Charity number: 1147153
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £83.92k £61.52k £59.06k £69.53k £109.28k
Total expenditure £72.19k £66.46k £62.48k £59.41k £63.81k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £33.52k