THE ARSENAL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve sickness or distress of any persons including, in particular among those who may be injured while participating in any sport To promote community participation in healthy recreation by providing facilities To advance the education of children and other persons To relieve poverty, hardship and economic deprivation within the community
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£90k to £100k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Camden
- Hackney
- Haringey
- Islington
Governance
- 30 January 2012: Standard registration
- 13 February 2013: Funds received from 1008024 THE ARSENAL FOUNDATION
- THE ARSENAL FOUNDATION (Working name)
- THE ARSENAL FOUNDATION LIMITED (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Paul Garlick | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Katie Simpson Lloyd | Trustee | 21 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Vincent Maloney | Trustee | 20 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Frederick John Hudson | Trustee | 23 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW JOLLY | Trustee | 01 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
ALAN CHARLES SEFTON | Trustee | 30 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
SVENJA STEFANIE GEISSMAR | Trustee | 26 January 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £386.04k | £266.86k | £1.12m | £1.27m | £498.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.35m | £330.11k | £807.15k | £780.03k | £727.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £1.12m | £1.27m | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £774.65k | £740.31k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £32.50k | £39.73k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £13.58k | £80.66k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £669.02k | £627.28k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 28 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 28 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 05 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 05 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 09 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 09 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 07 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 07 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 13 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 13 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 25 JAN 2012 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 15/05/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15 JAN 2021
Charitable objects
THE COMPANY'S OBJECTS (OBJECTS) ARE TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC GENERALLY, BOTH IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND OVERSEAS, INCLUDING (BUT NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION): 3.1. FOR THE GENERAL PURPOSES OF SUCH CHARITABLE BODIES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE; 3.2. TO RELIEVE SICKNESS OR DISTRESS OF ANY PERSONS THROUGH SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT, INCLUDING, IN PARTICULAR (BUT NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION) AMONG THOSE WHO MAY BE INJURED WHILE PARTICIPATING IN ANY SPORT AND OF ANY DEPENDANT OF ANY PERSON(S) WHO MAY BE INJURED OR KILLED WHILE PARTICIPATING IN ANY SPORT; 3.3. TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF ASSOCIATION FOOTBALL AND OTHER SPORTS CAPABLE OF IMPROVING HEALTH ("FACILITIES" IN THIS ARTICLE 3 MEANS LAND, BUILDINGS, EQUIPMENT AND ORGANISING SPORTING ACTIVITIES); 3.4. TO PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR SPORT, RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF SUCH PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED FOR SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; 3.5. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND OTHER PERSONS (INCLUDING THEIR ACADEMIC, SOCIAL, PHYSICAL EDUCATION AND SKILLS TRAINING) THROUGH SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAW OF CHARITY; 3.6. TO RELIEVE POVERTY, HARDSHIP AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION WITHIN THE COMMUNITY BY PROVIDING FINANCIAL AND OTHER MATERIAL ASSISTANCE TO THOSE IN NEED OR BY SUCH OTHER MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
HIGHBURY HOUSE
75 DRAYTON PARK
LONDON
N5 1BU
- Phone:
- 02077044406
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window