ST JAMES' INFANT AND JUNIOR SCHOOLS PTA

Charity number: 1147450
Charity reporting is up to date (31 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £31.70k £36.79k £37.29k £32.60k £21.65k
Total expenditure £31.66k £43.94k £24.23k £60.69k £1.98k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A