Financial history THE REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD - PRAISE CITY

Charity number: 1146132
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £71.66k £77.04k £92.25k £64.77k £79.19k
Total expenditure £82.76k £76.18k £69.91k £48.93k £78.01k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £2.40k