Accounts and annual returns SUTTERTON PAROCHIAL CHARITIES (SUTTERTON SHARE)

Charity number: 502575
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 02 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 02 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 20 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 20 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 26 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required