Accounts and annual returns EDEN NETWORK YORKSHIRE

Charity number: 1147494
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2020 11 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2019 02 November 2020 63 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2018 02 September 2019 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2017 22 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 22 August 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2016 11 January 2018 133 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2016 11 January 2018 133 days late Download Open in new window