Financial history EDEN NETWORK YORKSHIRE

Charity number: 1147494
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020
Total gross income £54.65k £47.55k £19.44k £14.89k £10.44k
Total expenditure £42.39k £115.29k £26.95k £19.20k £7.29k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A