Accounts and annual returns BACKSTAGE TRUST

Charity number: 1145887
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 17 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 17 December 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 16 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 16 November 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2019 10 February 2020 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 10 February 2020 5 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2018 21 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 21 December 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2017 16 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 16 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window