Accounts and annual returns ST JOHN'S GREEN PLAYGROUP LTD
Charity number: 1147606
Charity reporting is overdue by 299 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 02 October 2023 | 94 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 299 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 02 October 2023 | 459 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 09 May 2022 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 02 October 2023 | 824 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 09 May 2022 | 313 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 21 June 2021 | 356 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 01 October 2020 | 93 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2018 | 15 January 2020 | 199 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2018 | 05 December 2019 | 158 days late | Download Open in new window |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window