ROTHERHAM RESCUE RANGERS

Charity number: 1146955
Charity reporting is up to date (9 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £12.96k £14.25k £13.79k £24.77k £17.44k
Total expenditure £18.36k £20.00k £12.69k £21.67k £15.63k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A £120 N/A