Accounts and annual returns GREAT LEVER EDUCATION AND WELFARE TRUST

Charity number: 1146143
Charity reporting is up to date (3 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 03 February 2022 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 03 February 2022 3 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 26 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 26 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 22 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 22 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 28 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 28 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 28 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

28 December 2017 On time Download Open in new window