ZIAIA WELFARE

Charity number: 1146340
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £21.04k £20.77k £13.23k £13.36k £9.25k
Total expenditure £21.03k £20.78k £14.38k £9.76k £10.18k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A