Financial history THE BLOOMFIELD CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1145866
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 06/02/2018 06/02/2019 06/02/2020 06/02/2021 06/02/2022
Total gross income £64.52k £42.05k £304.13k £344.43k £581.85k
Total expenditure £67.64k £41.85k £317.82k £406.19k £617.21k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £98.11k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £483.73k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £584.73k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £32.47k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £2.10k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £556.04k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £32.47k
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0