ROTHERHAM STREET PASTORS

Charity number: 1150210
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 20 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 22 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 12 November 2019 105 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 24 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2016 11 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Not Required