ROTHERHAM STREET PASTORS

Charity number: 1150210
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £6.09k £6.31k £7.92k £4.57k £4.86k
Total expenditure £5.55k £5.66k £5.89k £3.45k £3.28k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A