ROTHERHAM STREET PASTORS

Charity number: 1150210
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Michael Thomas Trustee 12 November 2019 None on record
JILL ROWLANDS Trustee 27 February 2013
46TH ST CUTHBERTS (ROTHERHAM) SCOUT GROUP Received: On time
JONATHAN BUCKLEY Trustee 10 November 2020
PXI PARSON CROSS INITIATIVE (PROJECTS) Received: On time
CHURCHES FOR YOUTH IN SHEFFIELD 17 Received: On time
KNOWNVALUEDLOVED Recently registered
Hannah Proctor Trustee 24 November 2016 None on record
PAUL HUNT Trustee 01 August 2010 None on record