Accounts and annual returns FOURTEEN-A LIMITED

Charity number: 1147552
Charity reporting is up to date (22 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2022 22 June 2023 22 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 08 June 2022 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 27 October 2021 149 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 02 October 2020 124 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 02 October 2020 124 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2018 24 September 2019 116 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 24 September 2019 116 days late Download Open in new window