Accounts and annual returns REFRESH BRISTOL

Charity number: 1147065
Charity reporting is overdue by 420 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 July 2023 Overdue Overdue by 54 days
Accounts and TAR 30 July 2023 Overdue Overdue by 54 days
Annual return 30 July 2022 Overdue Overdue by 420 days
Accounts and TAR 30 July 2022 Overdue Overdue by 420 days
Annual return 30 July 2021 25 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 July 2021 15 June 2022 16 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 July 2020 11 June 2021 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 July 2020 11 June 2021 12 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2019 06 August 2020 159 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019

(These accounts
have been qualified)

06 August 2020 159 days late Download Open in new window