Financial history REFRESH BRISTOL

Charity number: 1147065
Charity reporting is overdue by 419 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/07/2020 30/07/2021
Total gross income £21.07k £27.77k £39.20k £39.20k £84.49k
Total expenditure £18.37k £24.76k £40.48k £40.78k £32.40k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £36.86k