Accounts and annual returns ALL SAINTS KINGSTON DEVELOPMENT TRUST

Charity number: 1146858
Charity reporting is overdue by 98 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 98 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 98 days
Annual return 31 December 2020 17 March 2022 137 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 13 November 2020 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 07 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 25 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required