Financial history ALL SAINTS KINGSTON DEVELOPMENT TRUST

Charity number: 1146858
Charity reporting is overdue by 100 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £43.32k £15.33k £19.58k £8.81k £3.39k
Total expenditure £60.54k £85.03k £42.17k £8.45k £732
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A