Financial history SOLIHULL ACTION THROUGH ADVOCACY

Charity number: 1146073
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £430.09k £362.63k £563.06k £550.03k £555.49k
Total expenditure £421.30k £402.44k £561.31k £533.25k £544.52k
Income from government contracts £301.36k £259.84k £427.60k £442.80k £428.80k
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £1.50k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £5.04k £3.46k £1.38k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £557.92k £546.54k £554.10k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £95 £25 £13
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £560.94k £533.08k £544.40k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £0 £1.28k £1.27k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £373 £166 £113