Accounts and annual returns EAST SIDE YOUTH CENTRE LTD

Charity number: 1147968
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2021 02 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2020 18 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2019 07 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2018 04 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2017 01 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2017 Not Required