THE DOUGLAS HAIG FELLOWSHIP

Charity number: 1150833
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 671 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 671 days
Annual return 31 March 2018 20 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 29 March 2018 57 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 11 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2015 10 March 2016 39 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 Not Required