THE DOUGLAS HAIG FELLOWSHIP

Charity number: 1150833
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018
Total gross income £8.41k £5.54k £5.22k £5.78k £4.77k
Total expenditure £7.59k £4.19k £4.39k £5.24k £4.84k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A