Accounts and annual returns FIREFLY CANCER AWARENESS AND SUPPORT LIMITED

Charity number: 1147235
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2021 27 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 27 July 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2020 07 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 07 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2019 16 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 16 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2018 05 March 2019 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 05 March 2019 5 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2017 21 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 21 October 2017 On time Download Open in new window