Financial history FIREFLY CANCER AWARENESS AND SUPPORT LIMITED

Charity number: 1147235
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020 30/04/2021
Total gross income £202.63k £250.78k £324.62k £353.18k £274.43k
Total expenditure £164.96k £227.64k £262.40k £319.81k £303.27k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £10.00k