Financial history COMMUNITY ASSETS PLUS

Charity number: 1148814
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £32.96k £20.75k £24.62k £57.43k £65.13k
Total expenditure £30.53k £33.20k £39.53k £50.83k £43.91k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A