THE MUBAN EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity number: 1152357
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2020 17 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 17 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2019 13 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 30 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2018 24 July 2019 115 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 13 November 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2017 19 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

16 November 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2016 21 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

27 September 2016 On time Download